Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Rf Partners-2000, Ltd, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Justin Strother, against Morello, Frank, Radunare Equities, Llc, represented by Anthony L Laporte, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Bays, Kristin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBays, Kristin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 19, 2020 |
CategoryContract Consumer/Commercial/Debt >$200,000 |
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed |
Order Granting Nonsuit
Date: October 19, 2020Docket Control Order
Date: September 22, 2020Original Answer
Date: September 21, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial CANCELED Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bays, Kristin) Case Disposed Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
October 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
E-Notice Envelope Number:
Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
October 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order of Nonsuit With Prejudice Order Granting Nonsuit Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
October 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion (No Fee)
Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
September 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Docket Control Order
Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
September 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Original Answer, Request for Disclosure Notice of Intent to use Documents, and Jury Dema Original Answer Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
September 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Jury Fee Paid
Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
September 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Requested
Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
August 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
CitationMorello, Frank Unserved
Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
August 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
CitationRadunare Equities, LLC Unserved
Judge: Bays, Kristin |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.