Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
2Ml Real Estate Interest Inc, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Hugh L Mckenney, against Montgomery Central Appraisal District, represented by Carol Barton, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Bays, Kristin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBays, Kristin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 19, 2020 |
CategoryReal Property - Other |
Last RefreshedDecember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Entry of Judgment Notification Submission CANCELED Submission (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bays, Kristin) Case Disposed Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
E-Notice Envelope Number:
Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Agreed Final Judgment Agreed Judgment Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
May 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Docket Control Order Bench Trial CANCELED Bench Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bays, Kristin) Case Disposed05/17/2021Reset by Court to 05/19/2021 Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Entry of Judgment Notification Notice Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Rule 11 Settlement Agreement Rule 11 Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Trial Notification Notice Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
May 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law Proposed Order Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
May 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Witness List No Fee Documents Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
April 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Joint Filing Notice Notice Judge: Bays, Kristin |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.