Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Pfannstiel, Daniel Merrill, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Pfannstiel, Jennifer, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Scharlene W. Valdez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeScharlene W. Valdez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 18, 2020 |
CategoryDivorce With Children |
Last RefreshedSeptember 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Settlement Agreements
Date: February 10, 2021Docket Control Order
Date: October 16, 2020E-Filed Original Petition Document
Date: August 18, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Bench Trial CANCELED Bench Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gilbert, Tracy A) Agreed Resolution Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
March 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Conference CANCELED Pre-Trial Conference (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gilbert, Tracy A) Agreed Resolution Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
February 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Agreed Final Decree of Divorce
Judge: Valdez, Scharlene |
|
February 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry (Judicial Officer: Valdez, Scharlene )
Judge: : Valdez, Scharlene |
|
February 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Prove-Up (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gilbert, Tracy A)
Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Mediated Settlement Agreement Settlement Agreements Judge: Valdez, Scharlene |
|
February 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Parenting Certificate
Judge: Valdez, Scharlene |
|
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Parenting Certificate
Judge: Valdez, Scharlene |
|
October 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Envelopes Docket Control Order Judge: Valdez, Scharlene |
|
September 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Waiver of Service
Judge: Valdez, Scharlene |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.