Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Mcneal, Jederick Austin, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Groulz, Kia, Mcneal, Kia Lynn, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Tracy A. Gilbert presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTracy A. Gilbert Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 12, 2020 |
CategoryDivorce With Children |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Settlement Agreements
Date: August 24, 2021Signed Order
Date: August 25, 2021Proposed Order
Date: August 19, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Bench Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gilbert, Tracy A)
Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Conference (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gilbert, Tracy A)
Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Prove-Up (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gilbert, Tracy A)
Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Bench Trial CANCELED Bench Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gilbert, Tracy A) Other Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event | No Fee Documents | |
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Signed Order Granting Motion for Continuance Signed Order |
|
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry (Judicial Officer: Gilbert, Tracy A )
Judge: : Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Prove-Up (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gilbert, Tracy A)
Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Mediated Settlement Agreement Settlement Agreements |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.