Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Citibank, N.A., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Timothy L. Elder, against Nipper, James, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Bays, Kristin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBays, Kristin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 12, 2020 |
CategoryContract Consumer/Comm/Debt >$100,000 But <$200,000 |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed |
Dismiss for Want of Prosecution
Date: January 08, 2021Order of Dismissal
Date: December 29, 2020Motion to Dismiss
Date: December 28, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Show Cause Order Dismiss for Want of Prosecution CANCELED Dismiss for Want of Prosecution (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bays, Kristin) Case Disposed Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
December 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal
Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
December 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
E-Notice Envelope Number:
Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
December 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice Motion to Dismiss Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
December 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Injunction or Show Cause (OCA)
Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
September 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request For Service
Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
August 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
CitationNipper, James Returned Unserved 09/14/2020Returned09/14/2020
Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
August 14, 2020 | Docket Event | CitationNipper, James Unserved | |
August 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Original Petition with Requests for Disclosure and Request for Admissions E-Filed Original Petition Document Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
August 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request For Service
Judge: Bays, Kristin |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.