Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
State Of Texas, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Collins, Brittany Diane, Parsons, Gordon Lee, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Charles T. Moreland presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCharles T. Moreland Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 06, 2020 |
Category(Title Iv-D Oag Use Only) Establishment |
Last RefreshedDecember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Durst, J.C.)
Judge: Durst, J.C. |
|
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for New Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Durst, J.C.)
Judge: Durst, J.C. |
|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | CitationParsons, Gordon Lee, Jr. Unserved | |
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Cover Letter Letters |
|
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Setting Hearing set for October 14, 2021 at 9:00 A.M. Signed Order |
|
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Request For Service | |
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Reset Order set for 10/14/2021 at 9am Signed Order |
|
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Docket Entry | |
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Moreland, Charles T)
Judge: Moreland, Charles T |
|
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event | (Title IV-D OAG Use Only) Service Documents |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.