Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Falls At Imperial Oaks Homeowners Association, Inc., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Brandi J Croffie, against Delao, Erin Leann, Delao, Luciano, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Bays, Kristin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBays, Kristin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 03, 2020 |
CategoryForeclosure - Other Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Writ - Order of Sale
Date: January 13, 2021Writ of Execution
Date: January 13, 2021Abstract of Judgement
Date: December 17, 2020Request For Service
Date: December 30, 2020Request For Service
Date: December 10, 2020Default Judgment
Date: October 06, 2020Motion (No Fee)
Date: October 05, 2020Return of Service
Date: August 11, 2020Request For Service
Date: August 03, 2020E-Filed Original Petition Document
Date: August 03, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Post Judgment - Order of Sale Writ - Order of Sale Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Post Judgment - Writ of Execution Writ of Execution Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
ServiceDelao, Luciano, Jr.Served02/24/2021Returned03/16/2021Delao, Erin Leann Returned Unserved 03/16/2021Returned03/16/2021
Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
ServiceDelao, Luciano, Jr. Unserved Delao, Erin Leann Unserved
Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
December 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Writ of Execution and Order of Sale Request For Service Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
December 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Post Judgment - Abstract Abstract of Judgement Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
December 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
ServiceDelao, Luciano, Jr. Unserved Delao, Erin Leann Unserved
Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
December 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Abstract of Judgment Request For Service Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Final Judgment Default Judgment Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
E-Notice Envelope Number:
Judge: Bays, Kristin |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.