Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Falls At Imperial Oaks Homeowners Association, Inc., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Brandi J Croffie, against Cline, Kristopher, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Santini, Vincenzo J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSantini, Vincenzo J Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 03, 2020 |
CategoryForeclosure - Other Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedSeptember 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed |
Intra-County Court Transfer Order
Date: August 04, 2020E-Filed Original Petition Document
Date: August 03, 2020Order Granting Nonsuit
Date: September 09, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
E-Notice Envelope Number:
Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
September 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order on Plaintiff's Notice of Nonsuit without Prejudice Order Granting Nonsuit Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
September 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Nonsuit
Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
August 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Return of Service
Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
August 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
7.2.20 administrative order Intra-County Court Transfer Order Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
August 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
CitationCline, KristopherServed08/10/2020Returned08/11/2020
Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
August 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Original Petition and Request for Declaratory Relief E-Filed Original Petition Document Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
August 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request For Service
Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
August 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA)
Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.