Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Tomz, Jannie Denise, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Tomz, Jeffrey William, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Wonderly, Scott presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWonderly, Scott Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 03, 2020 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedSeptember 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Judgment |
Answer
Date: August 10, 2020Cross Action/Counterpetition
Date: August 10, 2020E-Filed Original Petition Document
Date: August 03, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
No Fee Documents
Judge: Wonderly, Scott |
|
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry (Judicial Officer: Wonderly, Scott )
Judge: : Wonderly, Scott |
|
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Submission (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Robin, Jennifer J.)
Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
E-Notice Envelope Number:
Judge: Wonderly, Scott |
|
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Agreed Final Decree of Divorce
Judge: Wonderly, Scott |
|
September 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Submission CANCELED Submission (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Robin, Jennifer J.) Passed Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
September 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Submission (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Robin, Jennifer J.)
Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
September 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Affidavit
Judge: Wonderly, Scott |
|
September 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing
Judge: Wonderly, Scott |
|
September 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing
Judge: Wonderly, Scott |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.