Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Riverbrook Community Improvement Association D B A Riverbrook Property Owners Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Brandi J Croffie, against Allen, Deleese Kathleen, Williams, Michael, represented by William E. Harrison, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Bays, Kristin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBays, Kristin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 08, 2017 |
CategoryForeclosure - Other Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedSeptember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment After Non-Jury Trial |
Abstract of Judgement
Date: April 12, 2019Request
Date: March 26, 2019Proposed Order
Date: January 22, 2019Minute of the Court
Date: January 22, 2019Bench Trial
Date: January 22, 2019Motion for Continuance
Date: September 05, 2018Notice
Date: September 19, 2018No Fee Documents
Date: September 20, 2018Signed Order
Date: September 11, 2018Return of Service
Date: May 09, 2018Notice
Date: May 03, 2018Signed Order
Date: April 26, 2018Certificate
Date: April 23, 2018Motion for Continuance
Date: April 18, 2018Motion (No Fee)
Date: April 18, 2018Request For Service
Date: November 14, 2017Docket Control Order
Date: November 01, 2017Proposed Order
Date: October 30, 2017Response
Date: October 30, 2017Amended Petition
Date: November 08, 2017Notice
Date: September 27, 2017Proposed Order
Date: September 27, 2017Motion (No Fee)
Date: September 27, 2017Answer
Date: July 06, 2017Return of Service
Date: July 05, 2017Civil Case Information Sheet
Date: June 08, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request for Abstract of Judgment Abstract of Judgement Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
April 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
ServiceWilliams, Michael Unserved Allen, Deleese Kathleen Unserved
Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
March 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request for Abstract of Judgment Request Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
January 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proposed Agreed Interlocutory Judgment Proposed Order Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
January 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Minute of the Court: Judgment Minute of the Court Judge: Bays, Kristin Judgment of $4,265.10Awarded To: Riverbrook Community Improvement Association D/B/A Riverbrook Property Owners AssociationAwarded Against: Michael Williams, et al |
|
January 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Court's Cover Letter, Discovery Control Plan, Trial Preparation Order, Mediation Order Bench Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bays, Kristin) 05/21/2018Continued to 09/24/2018 - Agreed by Parties - Riverbrook Community Improvement Association D/B/A Riverbrook Property Owners Association09/24/2018Continued to 01/22/2019 - Agreed by Parties - Riverbrook Community Improvement Association D/B/A Riverbrook Property Owners Association; Williams, Michael Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
January 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry
Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
January 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Docket Call/Pre-Trial Conference (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bays, Kristin) 05/18/2018Continued to 09/14/2018 - Agreed by Parties - Riverbrook Community Improvement Association D/B/A Riverbrook Property Owners Association09/14/2018Continued to 01/18/2019 - Agreed by Parties - Riverbrook Community Improvement Association D/B/A Riverbrook Property Owners Association; Williams, Michael
Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
January 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry
Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
September 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Mediation Results Report **NOT SETTLED** No Fee Documents Judge: Bays, Kristin |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.