Case Last Refreshed: 18 hours ago
Siegle, Kathleen Ellen, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Siegle, Timothy Dale, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts 18th District Court with Sydney B. Hewlett presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSydney B. Hewlett Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 26, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedMarch 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House18th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet | |
November 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Final Hearing (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officers Hewlett, Sydney B, Hewlett, Sydney B) Result: Held | |
November 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Final Hearing (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officers Hewlett, Sydney B, Hewlett, Sydney B) | |
November 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
E-Mail Correspondence RE: Release of Amicus RE: Release of Amicus |
|
November 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Letter to Judge Sent to Court Sent to Court |
|
September 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Final Hearing ***Coordinator sent*** ***Coordinator sent*** |
|
September 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion to Withdraw (11:30 AM) (Judicial Officers Hewlett, Sydney B, Hewlett, Sydney B) | |
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel /NOH /NOH |
|
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel Sent to Court Sent to Court |
|
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order of Referral to Mediation & to Schedule Final Hearing & to Schedule Final Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.