Case Last Refreshed: 21 hours ago
Jones, Bailey Lynn, Jones, Jr., Geary Douglas, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Jones, Bailey Lynn, Jones, Jr., Geary Douglas, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts 249th District Court with William C. Bosworth, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam C. Bosworth, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 21, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedApril 18, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House249th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Decree |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
Temporary Order (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Strother, Tiffany)
Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
April 17, 2024 | Docket Event |
Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Strother, Tiffany) motion for in camera inspection and temp orders 04/01/2024 Reset by Court to 04/17/2024 Result: Held motion for in camera inspection and temp orders Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
April 17, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel emailed to atty emailed to atty Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
April 17, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order On Motion for Continuance emailed to parties emailed to parties Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion for Continuance
Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion to Withdraw as Counsel
Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
April 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
Subpoena Return
Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
April 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
Subpoena Issued Emailed Atty Emailed Atty Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
April 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
Application for Subpoena Duces Tecum
Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
April 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
Subpoena Lamontagne PA, Darci Unserved
Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.