Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Roe-Miller, Mollie, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Miller, Orlan Claude, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with William C. Bosworth, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam C. Bosworth, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 17, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Bosworth, William C, Jr.) Result: Held | |
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Rule 11 Agreement Sent to court via queue Sent to court via queue |
|
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing for Temporary Orders | |
July 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Agreed Temporary Injunction Agreed Temporary Mutual Injunction Agreed Temporary Mutual Injunction |
|
July 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Bosworth, William C, Jr.) Including Counter Petition TRO Result: Passed Including Counter Petition TRO |
|
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Answer | |
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned - EXECUTED - 06/22/2021 - EXECUTED - 06/22/2021 |
|
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order Returned - EXECUTED - 06/22/2021 - EXECUTED - 06/22/2021 |
|
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Counter/Cross Petition -Original Counterpetition for Divorce -Original Counterpetition for Divorce |
|
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order & OSH for Temporary Orders -No Iss/TRO -No Iss/TRO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.