Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Tinkle, Melissa Westfall, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Tinkle, Jeffrey Allen, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with Bridewell, Wayne presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBridewell, Wayne Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 01, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedAugust 07, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Decree |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
August 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
August 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Bridewell, Wayne) pro se no children - house - bringing fmc of deed with her to the hearing Result: Held pro se no children - house - bringing fmc of deed with her to the hearing Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
August 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Final Decree of Divorce
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letter from Court
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Final Decree of Divorce-Sent to Court in Box Final Decree of Divorce-Sent to Court in Box Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letter Requesting Hearing sent to court sent to court Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Waiver of Service
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) Original Petition for Divorce Original Petition for Divorce Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.