Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Perez, Sydney Lorraine, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Diaz, Gabriel Richard, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 28, 2021 |
CategoryParent-Child Relationship - No Divorce |
Last RefreshedSeptember 10, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Dismissal Docket (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bridewell, Wayne) | |
September 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Order - Dismissal - Case | |
August 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion to Withdraw (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Chrestman, Don) Result: Held | |
August 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Order on Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel | |
August 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Withdraw as Counsel NOH NOH |
|
July 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Dismissal Letter | |
July 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Orders in Suit Affecting the P/C Relationship | |
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Bailiff's Certificate of Call | |
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bridewell, Wayne) Result: Held | |
May 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order & OSH for Temporary Orders |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.