Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Hallmark, Christopher, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Hudson, Holly, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with William C. Bosworth, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam C. Bosworth, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 26, 2021 |
CategoryParent-Child Relationship - No Divorce |
Last RefreshedJune 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Plea to Jurisdiction (10:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Bosworth, William C, Jr.) Result: Held | |
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet | |
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry T/C from Judge Freeman in East Pasco Fl. Regarding pending SAPCR, Florida Homestate, Agreed to XD petitions and to notify Florida Judge of decision after Plea to Jurisdiction set 6-9-2021. -WCB T/C from Judge Freeman in East Pasco Fl. Regarding pending SAPCR, Florida Homestate, Agreed to XD petitions and to notify Florida Judge of decision after Plea to Jurisdiction set 6-9-2021. -WCB |
|
June 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Notice - Notice of Hearing - sent to court via que - Notice of Hearing - sent to court via que |
|
June 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer Respondent's Special Appearance, Plea to the Jurisdiction, Request for Court to Decline Jurisdication, and Original Answer - sent to court via que Respondent's Special Appearance, Plea to the Jurisdiction, Request for Court to Decline Jurisdication, and Original Answer - sent to court via que |
|
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned - EXECUTED - 05/27/2021 - EXECUTED - 05/27/2021 |
|
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Unsworn Declaration -Christopher Hallmark's Unsworn Declaration Pursuant to Civil Practice and Remedies Code 132.001 for Required UCCJEA Information -Christopher Hallmark's Unsworn Declaration Pursuant to Civil Practice and Remedies Code 132.001 for Required UCCJEA Information |
|
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) -Original Petition in Suit Affecting the Parent-Child Relationship -Original Petition in Suit Affecting the Parent-Child Relationship |
|
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued -Emailed to attorney -Emailed to attorney |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.