Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Green, Shelly Denise, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against White, Trent, Floyd, Brandy Green, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with Neill, John E. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNeill, John E. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 18, 2021 |
CategoryParent-Child Relationship - No Divorce |
Last RefreshedSeptember 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeAll Other Dispositions |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice sent sent Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order in Suit Affecting the Parent/Child Relationship
Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Default hearing (3:00 PM) (Judicial Officers Neill, John E., Neill, John E.) 07/09/2021 Reset by Court to 09/09/2021 Result: Held
Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letter Confirming Hearing Reset 9-9-2021 @ 10:30am - 9-9-2021 @ 10:30am - Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
June 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Temporary Orders in Suit Affecting the P/C Relationship emailed emailed Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Bailiff's Certificate of Call
Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Temporary (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officers Hewlett, Sydney B, Hewlett, Sydney B) Result: Held
Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned - EXECUTED - 05/25/2021 - EXECUTED - 05/25/2021 Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned - EXECUTED - 05/20/2021 - EXECUTED - 05/20/2021 Judge: Neill, John E. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.