Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Nobles, Karli Ann, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Spady, Trey Robert, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with Sydney B. Hewlett presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSydney B. Hewlett Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 17, 2021 |
CategoryParent-Child Relationship - No Divorce |
Last RefreshedMay 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2023 | Docket Event | E-Mail Correspondence | |
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Requested Relief Office of the Attorney General's Requested Relief - took to 18th Coord for hearing today Office of the Attorney General's Requested Relief - took to 18th Coord for hearing today |
|
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Final Hearing (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officers Hewlett, Sydney B, Hewlett, Sydney B) 05/04/2023 Reset by Court to 05/25/2023 Result: Held | |
May 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Exhibit List | |
May 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Witness List | |
April 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Hearing - 5/25/23 @ 10am - sent to court Notice of Hearing Notice Of Hearing - 5/25/23 @ 10am - sent to court |
|
January 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Letter Confirming Hearing -Sent to Court -Sent to Court |
|
January 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request for Hearing -Sent to Court -Sent to Court |
|
January 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Letter - Mediation Unsuccessful | |
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Order on Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.