Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Shafer, Nicole Lee, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Martin, Jacob Aaron, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with William C. Bosworth, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam C. Bosworth, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 11, 2021 |
CategoryParent-Child Relationship - No Divorce |
Last RefreshedJune 17, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Agreement to Defer Required Disclosures to Defer Required Disclosures |
|
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary (10:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Bosworth, William C, Jr.) Result: Passed | |
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Counter/Cross Petition Respondent's Original Answer and Counterpetition in Suit Affecting the Parent-Child Relationship Respondent's Original Answer and Counterpetition in Suit Affecting the Parent-Child Relationship |
|
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Returned - EXECUTED - 05/18/2021 - EXECUTED - 05/18/2021 |
|
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned - EXECUTED - 05/18/2021 - EXECUTED - 05/18/2021 |
|
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice Martin, Jacob Aaron Served 05/18/2021 Returned 05/18/2021 | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Issued - emailed to atty - emailed to atty |
|
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing for Temporary Orders and Order to Appear | |
May 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Martin, Jacob Aaron Served 05/18/2021 Returned 05/18/2021 | |
May 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) -Original Petition in Suit Affecting the Parent-Child Relationship -Original Petition in Suit Affecting the Parent-Child Relationship |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.