Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Mouser, Rebecca Sue, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Mouser, Kyle Ray, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with William C. Bosworth, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam C. Bosworth, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 22, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedMay 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bosworth, William C, Jr.) Result: Held | |
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bosworth, William C, Jr.) | |
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Order on Motion to Extend Temporary Restraining Order | |
May 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Bosworth, William C, Jr.) Result: Passed | |
May 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion to Extend Temporary Restraining Order | |
May 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order on Motion to Extend TRO - taken to court Order on Motion to Extend TRO - taken to court |
|
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned -Returned Executed on 04/24/2021 -Returned Executed on 04/24/2021 |
|
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order Returned -Returned Executed on 04/24/2021 -Returned Executed on 04/24/2021 |
|
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued - emailed to atty - emailed to atty |
|
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order Issued - emailed to atty - emailed to atty |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.