Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Conner, Shannon, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Conner, Linda, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 13, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedJune 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Final Hearing (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Neill, John E.) Result: Held | |
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet | |
May 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letter Confirming Hearing - 06/18/2021 @ 10:00a.m. - 06/18/2021 @ 10:00a.m. |
|
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned EXECUTED 4-20-2021 EXECUTED 4-20-2021 |
|
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Conner, Linda Served 04/20/2021 Returned 04/21/2021 | |
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued Linda Conner Linda Conner |
|
April 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Letter Requesting Issuance of Citation(s) | |
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) Original Petition for Divorce Original Petition for Divorce |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.