Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Gabel, Dale Allen, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Gabel, Sara, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with William C. Bosworth, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam C. Bosworth, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 30, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedApril 14, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Bosworth, William C, Jr.) Result: Passed | |
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order Returned EXECUTED 4-6-2021 EXECUTED 4-6-2021 |
|
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned EXECUTED 4-6-2021 EXECUTED 4-6-2021 |
|
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Returned EXECUTED 4-6-2021 EXECUTED 4-6-2021 |
|
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Issued - emailed to atty - emailed to atty |
|
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order Issued - emailed to atty - emailed to atty |
|
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order GABEL, SARA Served 04/06/2021 Returned 04/07/2021 | |
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice GABEL, SARA Served 04/06/2021 Returned 04/07/2021 | |
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation GABEL, SARA Served 04/06/2021 Returned 04/07/2021 | |
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued - emailed to atty - emailed to atty |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.