Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Lang, Justin Todd, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Lang-Sprague, Sharon Margaret, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with Bridewell, Wayne presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBridewell, Wayne Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 25, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedJuly 02, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Decree |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Bailiff's Certificate of Call
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bridewell, Wayne) pro se no children - waiver on file - automobiles in Decree Result: Held pro se no children - waiver on file - automobiles in Decree Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Final Decree of Divorce
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letter Confirming Hearing
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letter Requesting Hearing
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Waiver of Service
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Power of Attorney to Transfer Motor Vehicle-2017 Chevrolet Silverado Power of Attorney Power of Attorney to Transfer Motor Vehicle-2017 Chevrolet Silverado Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Power of Attorney to Transfer Motor Vehicle-2018 Ford Focus Power of Attorney Power of Attorney to Transfer Motor Vehicle-2018 Ford Focus Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) -Original Petition for Divorce -Original Petition for Divorce Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.