Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Owens, Britany Lexus Ernst, Britany, Ernst, Britany, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Owens, Curtis Franklin, Howe, Joshua, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 25, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedJuly 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Bailiff's Certificate of Call | |
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Final Hearing (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bridewell, Wayne) Result: Held | |
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letter Confirming Hearing for July 19, 2021 @11:00 am for July 19, 2021 @11:00 am |
|
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Orders | |
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Letter Requesting Hearing | |
April 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officers Weeks, John Wilson, Weeks, John Wilson) Result: Held | |
April 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officers Bridewell, Wayne, Weeks, John Wilson) | |
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Waiver of Service | |
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Order on Motion to Extend Temporary Restraining Order | |
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order Issued Extended - emailed to atty Extended - emailed to atty |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.