Case Last Refreshed: 16 hours ago
Department Of Family & Protective Services, filed a(n) Child Protection - Family case against Frost, Amanda, Frost, Jonathan, Powledge, Marc, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts 18th District Court with Sydney B. Hewlett presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSydney B. Hewlett Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 19, 2019 |
CategoryChild Protective Services |
Last RefreshedApril 22, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Protection |
Filing Court House18th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 30, 2024 | Docket Event |
Permanency After Final Order Case Disposed CANCELED Permanency After Final Order (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officers Hewlett, Sydney B, Hewlett, Sydney B) Case Disposed |
|
December 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet | |
December 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Permanency After Final Order Case Disposed CANCELED Permanency After Final Order (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Hewlett, Sydney B) Case Disposed |
|
December 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order to Close File -filed 12/15/23 -filed 12/15/23 |
|
December 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Permanency After Final Order (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Hewlett, Sydney B) | |
December 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order to Close File-Sent to Court Order to Close File-Sent to Court |
|
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Permanency After Final Order (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officers Hewlett, Sydney B, Hewlett, Sydney B) Result: Held | |
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Permanency Hearing Order After Final Order | |
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Permanency After Final Order (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officers Hewlett, Sydney B, Hewlett, Sydney B) | |
June 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Child Service Plan S Frost CPOS - cps box S Frost CPOS - cps box |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.