Case Last Refreshed: 2 hours ago
Mathews, Leah, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Mathews, Tracey, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts 413th District Court with Bosworth, William C, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBosworth, William C, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 19, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedApril 19, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House413th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Decree |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Scan Box***** ***Scan Box #3790 *** ***Scan Box #3790 *** Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
November 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice
Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
November 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
November 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Agreed Final Decree of Divorce
Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Research Response copy emailed to April with Court Record Research (april@courtrecords.com) copy emailed to April with Court Record Research (april@courtrecords.com) Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Research Request for copies emailed to April with Court Record Research for copies emailed to April with Court Record Research Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Answer
Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Temporary Orders
Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bridewell, Wayne) Result: Held
Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order Returned Executed on 03/23/2021 Executed on 03/23/2021 Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.