Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Peters, Angela Irene, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Peters, Jeremy David, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 04, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedJuly 02, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice | |
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Final Hearing (2:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Bridewell, Wayne) Result: Held | |
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet | |
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letter Confirming Hearing - 07/01/2021 @ 2:30 p.m. - - 07/01/2021 @ 2:30 p.m. - |
|
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event | E-Mail Correspondence Setting Hearing | |
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Letter Requesting Hearing | |
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Orders | |
March 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bridewell, Wayne) zoom 958 4937 6562 Result: Held zoom 958 4937 6562 |
|
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order Returned - EXECUTED 3-5-2021 - EXECUTED 3-5-2021 |
|
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned - EXECUTED 3-5-2021 - EXECUTED 3-5-2021 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.