Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lemaster, Jamie Michelle, Haehnlein, Christopher Lee, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Buchholz, Brittany Dawn, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with Sydney B. Hewlett presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSydney B. Hewlett Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 02, 2021 |
CategoryParent-Child Relationship - No Divorce |
Last RefreshedApril 02, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary (3:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Hewlett, Sydney B) Result: Held | |
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order Returned - EXECUTED 3-4-2021 - EXECUTED 3-4-2021 |
|
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned - EXECUTED 3-4-2021 - EXECUTED 3-4-2021 |
|
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Buchholz, Brittany Dawn Served 03/04/2021 Returned 03/04/2021 | |
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued - emailed to atty - emailed to atty |
|
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order Issued - emailed to atty - emailed to atty |
|
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order & OSH for Temporary Orders emailed emailed |
|
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order Buchholz, Brittany Dawn Served 03/04/2021 Returned 03/04/2021 | |
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) Original Petition in Suit Affecting the Parent-Child Relationship - Iss cit/tro Original Petition in Suit Affecting the Parent-Child Relationship - Iss cit/tro |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.