Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Ogle, Lucas Glen, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Ogle, Brittany Lynn, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 12, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedJune 05, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice | |
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order - Final Decree of Divorce - sent to court que - Final Decree of Divorce - sent to court que |
|
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Final Hearing (2:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Bridewell, Wayne) 05/28/2021 Reset by Court to 06/04/2021 Result: Held | |
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet | |
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event | E-Mail Correspondence Setting Hearing | |
April 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Waiver of Service | |
February 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) Original Petition for Divorce Original Petition for Divorce |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.