Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Chick, Cathey Sue, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Chick, Donald Neil, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with Sydney B. Hewlett presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSydney B. Hewlett Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 19, 2020 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 05, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Temporary Orders emailed emailed |
|
September 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Bailiff's Certificate of Call | |
September 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Temporary (11:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Hewlett, Sydney B) Result: Held | |
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order Returned Executed on 08/24/2020 Executed on 08/24/2020 |
|
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned EXECUTED 8-24-2020 EXECUTED 8-24-2020 |
|
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned Executed on 08/24/2020 Executed on 08/24/2020 |
|
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order Returned EXECUTED 8-24-2020 EXECUTED 8-24-2020 |
|
August 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order & OSH for Temporary Orders | |
August 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued - emailed to atty - emailed to atty |
|
August 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order Chick, Donald Neil Served 08/24/2020 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.