Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Valenzuela, Emily Chanel, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Temengil, Tulob Jaydee, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with Bridewell, Wayne presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBridewell, Wayne Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 19, 2020 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 05, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Decree |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Certified Mail Sheet Return Lockheed Martin Corporation Lockheed Martin Corporation Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
September 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Scan Box *****SCAN BOX 3585***** *****SCAN BOX 3585***** Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
September 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Certified Mail Sheets Lockheed Martin Lockheed Martin Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
September 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Garnishment Fee Paid
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
September 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
September 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Final Decree of Divorce
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
September 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Income Withholding Order for Support *Sent 9/24/2020 *Sent 9/24/2020 Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
September 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing (9:45 AM) (Judicial Officer Weeks, John Wilson) Zoom 931 5578 5668 pro se divorce, 2 children, qdro, house, standard possession order Result: Held Zoom 931 5578 5668 pro se divorce, 2 children, qdro, house, standard possession order Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
September 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry -Letter from Parties regarding Final Decree of Divorce-Put in Court Box -Letter from Parties regarding Final Decree of Divorce-Put in Court Box Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
September 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Qualified Domestic Relations Order
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.