Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Cook, Daniel Bryan, Jones, Victoria Megan, Jones, Cindy  As Next Friend Of Victoria Jones, A Minor, Department Of Family And Protective Services, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Jones, Victoria Megan, Cook, Mason Christopher, Cook, Kimberly, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with Bosworth, William presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBosworth, William Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 19, 2020 |
CategoryParent-Child Relationship - No Divorce |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeAll Other Dispositions |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Withdraw (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Bosworth, William C, Jr.)
Judge: Barkley, David A |
|
October 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order -Order for Withdrawal of Attorney-Sent to Court Que -Order for Withdrawal of Attorney-Sent to Court Que Judge: Barkley, David A |
|
October 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for Withdrawal of Attorney-NOH Motion Motion for Withdrawal of Attorney-NOH Judge: Barkley, David A |
|
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Temporary Orders in Suit Affecting the P/C Relationship
Judge: Barkley, David A |
|
September 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Letter Requesting Hearing -Notice of Hearing-Sent to Court Que -Notice of Hearing-Sent to Court Que Judge: Barkley, David A |
|
September 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Enter Temporary Orders in SAPCR Motion to Enter Motion to Enter Temporary Orders in SAPCR Judge: Barkley, David A |
|
July 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Non-Suit *emailed *emailed Judge: Barkley, David A |
|
July 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Temporary (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bosworth, William C, Jr.) Result: Held
Judge: Barkley, David A |
|
July 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Temporary (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bosworth, William C, Jr.)
Judge: Barkley, David A |
|
July 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Subpoena Issued & Returned by Attorney - Madelyn Howard - Executed - Madelyn Howard - Executed Judge: Barkley, David A |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.