Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Tiwater, Thomas Kelly Glen, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Schroeder, Savannah, Shroeder, Savannah, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with Bridewell, Wayne presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBridewell, Wayne Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 05, 2020 |
CategoryParent-Child Relationship - No Divorce |
Last RefreshedApril 02, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment/Non Jury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Scan Box ***** Scan Box 3660 ***** ***** Scan Box 3660 ***** Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order in Suit Affecting the Parent/Child Relationship
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice /ORDER (emailed attys Bill Conover, Tiffany Strother, OAG; mailed to Savannah Schroeder) /ORDER (emailed attys Bill Conover, Tiffany Strother, OAG; mailed to Savannah Schroeder) Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing (3:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Bridewell, Wayne) zoom id 973 7192 8437 there is a hearing set before Judge Bridewell in the 249th on temp orders. AG set a hearing before Judge Conine as well. different zoom numbers 02/05/2021 Reset by Court to 02/16/2021 02/16/2021 Reset by Court to 03/02/2021 Result: Held zoom id 973 7192 8437 there is a hearing set before Judge Bridewell in the 249th on temp orders. AG set a hearing before Judge Conine as well. different zoom numbers Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing Other CANCELED Hearing (3:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Conine, Casey Raymond) Other ZOOM ID# 910 7881 2591 Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Green Card Returns Green Card Returned on Savannah Schroeder 02/25/2021 Green Card Returned on Savannah Schroeder 02/25/2021 Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Green Card Returns
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
E-Mail Correspondence Setting Hearing RE:Resetting 2/5/21 hearing to 2/16/21 RE:Resetting 2/5/21 hearing to 2/16/21 Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letter Confirming Hearing for February 5, 2021 @1:30 p.m.-Sent to court via que for February 5, 2021 @1:30 p.m.-Sent to court via que Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.