Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Massey, Chancy Rae, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Massey, Justin Allen, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with Bridewell, Wayne presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBridewell, Wayne Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 01, 2020 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedOctober 15, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Decree |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Nunc Pro Tunc Final Decree of Divorce
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Sign (10:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Bridewell, Wayne) Result: Held
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Nunc Pro Tunc Order Nunc Pro Tunc Agreed Order - emailed Nunc Pro Tunc Agreed Order - emailed Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Sign NOH- Nunc Pro Tunc Final Decree of Divorce - Nunc Pro Tunc Agreed Order - signed NOH- Nunc Pro Tunc Final Decree of Divorce - Nunc Pro Tunc Agreed Order - signed Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
July 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Sign (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bridewell, Wayne) Result: Held
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
July 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
E-Mail Correspondence
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letter confirming hearing - 07-28-2021 11AM - Sent to court via queue Letter Confirming Hearing Letter confirming hearing - 07-28-2021 11AM - Sent to court via queue Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
July 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order - Agreed Order - Agreed Order Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.