Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Mccollum, Amanda Renee, Northcott, Nathan Earl, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Mccollum, Amanda Renee, Northcott, Nathan Earl, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with Strother, Tiffany presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStrother, Tiffany Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 01, 2020 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedSeptember 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Decree |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Strother, Tiffany) reset on the record 9/11/23 and j. enright added in Result: Held reset on the record 9/11/23 and j. enright added in Judge: Strother, Tiffany |
|
September 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Strother, Tiffany) reset on the record 9/11/23 and j. enright added in reset on the record 9/11/23 and j. enright added in Judge: Strother, Tiffany |
|
September 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Original Answer Respondent's Original Answer Respondent's Original Answer Judge: Strother, Tiffany |
|
September 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Amicus Attorney's Original Answer
Judge: Strother, Tiffany |
|
September 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Strother, Tiffany) Result: Held
Judge: Strother, Tiffany |
|
September 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appointment of Attorney emailed emailed Judge: Strother, Tiffany |
|
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned
Judge: Strother, Tiffany |
|
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order Returned
Judge: Strother, Tiffany |
|
August 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order McCollum, Amanda Renee Served 09/02/2023
Judge: Strother, Tiffany |
|
August 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued
Judge: Strother, Tiffany |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.