Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Sullivan, Ashley Nicole, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Sullivan, Robert Lynn, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with Hewlett, Sydney B presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHewlett, Sydney B Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 24, 2020 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 05, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Decree |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Attempted - Not Known Attempted - Not Known Judge: Hewlett, Sydney B |
|
September 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail
Judge: Hewlett, Sydney B |
|
September 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Scan Box ***** Scan Box 3582 ***** ***** Scan Box 3582 ***** Judge: Hewlett, Sydney B |
|
September 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice/Decree SENT SENT Judge: Hewlett, Sydney B |
|
September 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Hewlett, Sydney B |
|
September 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Agreed Final Hearing (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Hewlett, Sydney B) Result: Held
Judge: Hewlett, Sydney B |
|
September 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Agreed Final Decree of Divorce
Judge: Hewlett, Sydney B |
|
August 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Letter Setting Hearing 9-2-2020
Judge: Hewlett, Sydney B |
|
June 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Waiver of Service
Judge: Hewlett, Sydney B |
|
June 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Letter Requesting Hearing
Judge: Hewlett, Sydney B |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.