Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Karben, Brenda, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Karben, David, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with Bosworth, William C, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBosworth, William C, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 17, 2020 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 05, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Decree |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Agreed Final Decree of Divorce
Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice/Decree mailed to both parties mailed to both parties Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing (9:15 AM) (Judicial Officer Bosworth, William C, Jr.) Result: Held
Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Scan Box ***** Scan Box 3598 ***** ***** Scan Box 3598 ***** Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
September 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Letter Setting Hearing
Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
June 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Letter Requesting Hearing Sent to Court Sent to Court Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
June 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Proposed Agreed Final Decree of Divorce-Sent to Court Proposed Agreed Final Decree of Divorce-Sent to Court Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
May 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Waiver of Service
Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
April 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) Original Petition for Divorce-No Service Original Petition for Divorce-No Service Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.