Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Department Of Family And Protective Services, filed a(n) Child Protection - Family case against Wright, Tiffany, Stephens, James Lavon, Iii, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 20, 2019 |
CategoryChild Protective Services |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Protection |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Permanency After Final Order Other CANCELED Permanency After Final Order (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officers Bridewell, Wayne, Weeks, John Wilson) Other |
|
September 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Order of Assignment *****Transferred to CPS Court***** | |
September 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Attorney Pay Sheet - Rob Ward (includes mediation) - Rob Ward (includes mediation) |
|
September 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Attorney Pay Sheet Toni Driver (mediation)- Emailed Toni Driver (mediation)- Emailed |
|
September 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Order of Termination | |
September 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Attorney Pay Sheet - Curt Crum - Curt Crum |
|
September 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bridewell, Wayne) Zoom 959 9845 3445 Result: Held Zoom 959 9845 3445 |
|
September 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Bailiff's Certificate of Call | |
September 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Final Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bridewell, Wayne) | |
September 14, 2020 | Docket Event | E-Mail Correspondence Setting Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.