Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Halcomb, Julie Ann, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Halcomb, Thomas Eugene, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 16, 2018 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Sign (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gabriel, Lee) VIA ZOOM 985 0821 4378 Result: Held VIA ZOOM 985 0821 4378 |
|
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Second amended motion to sign decree of divorce - Second amended motion to sign decree of divorce - |
|
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event | E-Mail Correspondence | |
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order First amended motion to sign decree of divorce - sent to court via queue First amended motion to sign decree of divorce - sent to court via queue |
|
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letter Confirming Hearing for July 28, 2021 @9:00 am-Sent to court via que for July 28, 2021 @9:00 am-Sent to court via que |
|
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Sign Decree of Divorce Motion to Sign Motion to Sign Decree of Divorce |
|
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officers Bridewell, Wayne, Gabriel, Lee) day 2 of 2 day final 05/25/2021 Reset by Court to 06/29/2021 day 2 of 2 day final |
|
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request Petitioner's Requested Relief Petitioner's Requested Relief |
|
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Other Petitioner's Requested Relief ***DUPLICATE FILING*** Petitioner's Requested Relief ***DUPLICATE FILING*** |
|
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gabriel, Lee) day 1 of 2 day final bench trial 05/24/2021 Reset by Court to 06/28/2021 Result: Held day 1 of 2 day final bench trial |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.