Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Travis, Matthew, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Jones, Chasitie, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with Hewlett, Sydney B presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHewlett, Sydney B Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 13, 2018 |
CategoryAll Other Family Law Matters |
Last RefreshedMarch 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Case Outcome TypeAll Other Dispositions |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice
Judge: Hewlett, Sydney B |
|
March 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Hewlett, Sydney B |
|
March 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Enforcing Child Support Obligation - Order Enforcing Child Support Order with Commitment Suspended - Order Enforcing Child Support Order with Commitment Suspended Judge: Hewlett, Sydney B |
|
March 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Information to Jailer
Judge: Hewlett, Sydney B |
|
March 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Enforcement (3:30 PM) (Judicial Officers Hewlett, Sydney B, Hewlett, Sydney B) Result: Held
Judge: Hewlett, Sydney B |
|
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Sheriff's Return
Judge: Hewlett, Sydney B |
|
December 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Amended Order - Amended and Corrected Order for Capias - Amended and Corrected Order for Capias Judge: Hewlett, Sydney B |
|
December 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Warrant Issued (Non OCA)
Judge: Hewlett, Sydney B |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order for Capias
Judge: Hewlett, Sydney B |
|
November 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
(LAC) Intervention Attorney General of Texas - emailed Attorney General of Texas - emailed Judge: Hewlett, Sydney B |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.