Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Rush, Brianna Marie, Rush, Andrew, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Rush, Andrew, Rush, Brianna Marie, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2017 |
CategorySupport Order - Iv-D |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Conine, Casey Raymond) | |
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Order in Suit for Modification of Child Support Obligation | |
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Last Known Mailing Address | |
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Citation Returned | |
October 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Original Answer *emailed AG *emailed AG |
|
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Citation Returned | |
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Citation Rush, Brianna Marie Served 09/30/2022 Returned 10/04/2022 | |
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Citation Issue - PCT 1 Brianna M. Rush Brianna M. Rush |
|
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Citation Rush, Andrew Served 10/06/2022 Returned 10/31/2022 | |
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
(LAC) Motion to Modify Child Support - PJA Title IV-D (OCA) Suit for Modification of Child Support Order Suit for Modification of Child Support Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.