Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Webb, Victoria Condado, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Webb, Crawford, Iii, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with Bosworth, William C, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBosworth, William C, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2015 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Decree |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Ret Mail- No Mail Receptacle Ret Mail- No Mail Receptacle Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
April 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry *****************scan box 2520**************** *****************scan box 2520**************** Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
April 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
Final Decree of Divorce
Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
April 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Bosworth, William C, Jr.) Result: Held
Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
April 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice /Decree ( Victoria & Crawford Webb) /Decree ( Victoria & Crawford Webb) Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
April 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
April 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
Qualified Domestic Relations Order
Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
March 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
Letter Setting Final Hearing for 4-20-16 at 1:30pm Setting Final Hearing for 4-20-16 at 1:30pm Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
March 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Proposed QDRO- sent to court Proposed QDRO- sent to court Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
March 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
Letter req final hearing on divorce w/ copy of proposed final decree- sent to court Letter Letter req final hearing on divorce w/ copy of proposed final decree- sent to court Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.