Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Moreno, James Thomas, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Abbott, Rachel Lynn, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 18, 2015 |
CategoryAll Other Family Law Matters |
Last RefreshedApril 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bridewell, Wayne) day 2 of final 03/19/2021 Reset by Court to 04/20/2021 Result: Held day 2 of final |
|
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bridewell, Wayne) day 2 of final 03/19/2021 Reset by Court to 04/20/2021 day 2 of final |
|
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bridewell, Wayne) 2 day final ZOom 920 2022 9832 03/18/2021 Reset by Court to 03/19/2021 03/19/2021 Reset by Court to 04/19/2021 Result: Held 2 day final ZOom 920 2022 9832 |
|
February 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Subpoena Issued & Returned by Attorney | |
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event | E-Mail Correspondence Setting Hearing | |
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event | E-Mail Correspondence Setting Hearing | |
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order Resetting Trial Resetting Trial |
|
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officers Weeks, John Wilson, Weeks, John Wilson) Continuting from 12/3/2020 Zoom 925 1834 9754 Result: Held Continuting from 12/3/2020 Zoom 925 1834 9754 |
|
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Agreed Motion to Reset Trial to Reset Trial |
|
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event | E-Mail Correspondence |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.