Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Milburn, Jordan Lillie, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Milburn, Nolan Ryan, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with Isaacks, Vicki presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeIsaacks, Vicki Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 11, 2015 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed No Prosecution |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Scan Box ****SCAN BOX 3114***** ****SCAN BOX 3114***** Judge: Isaacks, Vicki |
|
July 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution
Judge: Isaacks, Vicki |
|
July 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Isaacks, Vicki |
|
July 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice /Order (emailed atty) /Order (emailed atty) Judge: Isaacks, Vicki |
|
July 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Docket (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officers Bridewell, Wayne, Isaacks, Vicki) Result: Dismissed
Judge: Isaacks, Vicki |
|
May 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Letter sent to Patrick Barkman sent to Patrick Barkman Judge: Isaacks, Vicki |
|
October 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order on Motion to Retain Case on Docket
Judge: Isaacks, Vicki |
|
October 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Docket Other CANCELED Dismissal Docket (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Bridewell, Wayne) Other Judge: Isaacks, Vicki |
|
October 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion to Retain Case on Docket / NOH Motion Motion to Retain Case on Docket / NOH Judge: Isaacks, Vicki |
|
September 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Letter -Patrick Barkman -Patrick Barkman Judge: Isaacks, Vicki |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.