Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Baker, James Todd, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Baker, Amanda Lee, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with Bosworth, William C, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBosworth, William C, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 10, 2015 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Decree |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry *****************scan box 2568**************** *****************scan box 2568**************** Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
July 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
July 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice /Decree (James Baker & Amanda Baker) /Decree (James Baker & Amanda Baker) Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
June 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Bosworth, William C, Jr.) Result: Held
Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
May 31, 2016 | Docket Event |
Letter Setting Hearing for 6-29-16 at 2:00pm Setting Hearing for 6-29-16 at 2:00pm Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
April 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry Letter requisting final hearing - attached final divorce decree - sent to court Letter requisting final hearing - attached final divorce decree - sent to court Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
April 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Letter Requesting Final Hearing-sent to court Requesting Final Hearing-sent to court Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
April 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Final Decree Sent to Court Final Decree Sent to Court Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
January 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
Waiver of service only Waiver of Service Waiver of service only Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
December 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) Original petition for divorce -no service Original petition for divorce -no service Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.