Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Clinton, Rolland Scott, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Clinton, Christina C., in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with William C. Bosworth, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam C. Bosworth, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 09, 2015 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry ***************SCAN BOX 2489**************** ***************SCAN BOX 2489**************** |
|
February 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice /Decree (Michael Kurmes & Christina Clinton) /Decree (Michael Kurmes & Christina Clinton) |
|
February 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Final Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Bosworth, William C, Jr.) Result: Held | |
February 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet | |
February 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Bailiff's Certificate of Call | |
January 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
Letter to Kori Everett-Ret from court Letter Letter to Kori Everett-Ret from court |
|
December 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Citation Clinton, Christina C. Served 12/11/2015 Returned 12/14/2015 | |
December 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) Original petition for divorce-iss cit-ret Original petition for divorce-iss cit-ret |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.