Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Johnson County Special Utility District, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by D Scott Cain, against Alonso, Richardo, represented by Jeffrey S Davis, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with Bridewell, Wayne presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBridewell, Wayne Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 07, 2022 |
CategoryInjury/Damage - Other Injury Or Damage |
Last RefreshedApril 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Final Judgment
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
April 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Bridewell, Wayne) set on the record at the 2/7/2022 hearing set on the record at the 2/7/2022 hearing Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
April 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
April 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for Continuance
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Final Judgment Final Judgment Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Affidavit -Affidavit Supporting Attorney's Fees & Costs -Affidavit Supporting Attorney's Fees & Costs Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officers Bridewell, Wayne, Weeks, John Wilson) show cause/ final trial Result: Held show cause/ final trial Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Affidavit
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
E-Mail Correspondence Setting Hearing
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
November 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause sent, copy mailed to respondent. sent, copy mailed to respondent. Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.