Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Brg Lone Star, Ltd., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Graham K Simms, against Atlas Barnett, Llc, represented by John K Hicks Hicks, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with Bridewell, Wayne presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBridewell, Wayne Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 11, 2020 |
CategoryContract - Other |
Last RefreshedMarch 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeCases Non-Suited Or Dismissed By Plaintiff |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Scan Box ***** Scan Box 3597 ***** ***** Scan Box 3597 ***** Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice /ORDER (emailed attys Graham Simms & John Hicks) /ORDER (emailed attys Graham Simms & John Hicks) Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
October 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal with Prejudice
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
October 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Nonsuit With Prejudice -Sent to court via que -Sent to court via que Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
June 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Original Answer Defendant's Original Answer Defendant's Original Answer Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
June 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned Executed on 06/15/2020 Executed on 06/15/2020 Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
June 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Green Card Returns 7019 0700 0001 4509 0638
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
June 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Certified Mail Receipts 7019 0700 0001 4509 0638
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
June 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Citation Atlas Barnett, LLC Served 06/05/2020
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.