Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Overseas Military Sales Corporation - Omsc, Ltd, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Rwan S. Hardesty, against Martinez, Rico, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 17, 2021 |
CategoryContract - Other |
Last RefreshedApril 16, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion Summary Judgment (3:30 PM) (Judicial Officers Hewlett, Sydney B, Hewlett, Sydney B) | |
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing 4-15-2021 @ 3:30pm - 4-15-2021 @ 3:30pm - |
|
March 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment | |
March 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order -Summary Judgment-Sent to court via que -Summary Judgment-Sent to court via que |
|
July 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Original Answer | |
June 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned Executed on 06/16/2020 Rico Martinez Executed on 06/16/2020 Rico Martinez |
|
June 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued - emailed to atty - emailed to atty |
|
June 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Citation Martinez, Rico Served 06/16/2020 | |
June 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) Plaintiff's Original Petition for Deficiency Judgment - Iss cit Plaintiff's Original Petition for Deficiency Judgment - Iss cit |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.