Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Morgan, Katie, Benchmark Building & Construction, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Lindy D Jones, against Christin Myers D B A Venom Iron Doors, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with Hewlett, Sydney B presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHewlett, Sydney B Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 17, 2021 |
CategoryContract - Consumer/Commercial/Debt |
Last RefreshedApril 02, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice/Judgment SENT SENT Judge: Hewlett, Sydney B |
|
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment
Judge: Hewlett, Sydney B |
|
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Hewlett, Sydney B |
|
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Bailiff's Certificate of Call
Judge: Hewlett, Sydney B |
|
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Default hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Hewlett, Sydney B) Result: Held
Judge: Hewlett, Sydney B |
|
March 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing for March 29, 2021 @9:00 am- for March 29, 2021 @9:00 am- Judge: Hewlett, Sydney B |
|
July 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion to Enter Default Judgment - Motion to Enter Motion to Enter Default Judgment - Judge: Hewlett, Sydney B |
|
July 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Judgment Proposed Default Judgment - Sent to court via que Proposed Default Judgment - Sent to court via que |
|
June 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned - EXECUTED 6-10-2020 - EXECUTED 6-10-2020 Judge: Hewlett, Sydney B |
|
June 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Letter Requesting Issuance of Citation(s)
Judge: Hewlett, Sydney B |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.